open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana
    Case Number:1:15-cv-00562
    Party Name:W.P. v. ANTHEM INSURANCE COMPANIES INC
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Official Transcript]
    Date Published:November 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Closed Dismissed]
    Date Published:November 15, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission]
    Date Published:July 18, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:June 04, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
    Date Published:February 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time (Other)]
    Date Published:February 14, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:December 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:February 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:November 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief/Memorandum in Support]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit]
    Date Published:October 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment on the Pleadings]
    Date Published:April 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Vacate]
    Date Published:February 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [0 - Scheduling]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion (Other)]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Submission of Signature Requirement]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Status Conference]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Procedures and Practices]
    Date Published:September 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Management Plan Tendered by]
    Date Published:September 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [SCHEDULING Order]
    Date Published:July 13, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:June 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear pro hac vice]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:June 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Attorney Information]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw Attorney Appearance]
    Date Published:June 17, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.insd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?57948
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =