U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:14-cv-02069
  • Case Name: MARK MCCLESKEY et al v. SCHALTENBRAND CONSTRUCTION, INC.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2015
  • December 01, 2015: [Closed Judgment]
  • December 01, 2015: [Entry]
November, 2015
  • November 06, 2015: [Application]
September, 2015
  • September 30, 2015: [Order]
  • September 30, 2015: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 30, 2015: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 29, 2015: [Vacate]
August, 2015
  • August 24, 2015: [Order on Motion for Continuance]
  • August 24, 2015: [0 - Scheduling]
  • August 21, 2015: [Continuance]
  • August 18, 2015: [Affidavit of Service]
July, 2015
  • July 27, 2015: [Order on Motion]
  • July 27, 2015: [0 - Scheduling]
  • July 21, 2015: [Motion (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.