U.S. Federal Court Records for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 15-08038--7
  • Case Name: David Lee Dotts and Catherine Dee Dotts
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2016
  • January 13, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [BNC Certificate of Service - Discharge Order]
  • January 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • January 08, 2016: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Discharge of Debtor(s)]
December, 2015
  • December 10, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Order in No Asset Case]
November, 2015
  • November 10, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • November 06, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Request for Notice]
  • November 05, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
October, 2015
  • October 30, 2015: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Friedmeyer, Joanne B. [Personal Financial Management Course Certificate]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.