open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:19-11199-reg
    Party Name:Gloria A. Bickel
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:October 31, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Approve]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Employ]
    Date Published:October 30, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:October 07, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:September 10, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Notice of Hearing]
    Date Published:August 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Seifert, Martin E. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:August 14, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?411299
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 2 =