open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:19-32054-hcd
    Party Name:Jabari Ja'vae Hillman and Kirsten Nicole Hillman
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Compensation - Order]
    Date Published:June 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Notice of Motion]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Compensation - Motion]
    Date Published:May 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Notice of Amendment]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Discharging Debtor (Auto)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Notice of Assets]
    Date Published:December 06, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Withdraw As Attorney]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Homann, Jacqueline S. [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:December 03, 2019
  • Source: https://ecf.innb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?414692
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 1 =