open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana

INDIANA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Indiana
    Case Number:2:19-cv-00492
    Party Name:Nickson v. United States Steel Corporation
  • Filing Type:Civil [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:June 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Preliminary - customized ddls & hrgs]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
    Date Published:February 20, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice - Other]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:February 19, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Hearings]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard - pptc already held or no pptc - form will be generated]
    Date Published:February 14, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.innd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?101596
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =