U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-po-00085-1
  • Case Name: USA vs GADDIE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order to Continue]
  • April 16, 2021: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 15, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [SCHEDULING Order]
March, 2021
  • March 04, 2021: [Citation Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Set Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.