U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mc-00030
  • Case Name: IMO 2021 Attorney Mass Suspension
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reinstate Disciplined Attorney]
  • June 23, 2022: [Reinstate Disciplined Attorney]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • October 01, 2021: [Mail Returned]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 24, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 23, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 20, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 17, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 17, 2021: [Letter]
  • September 15, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Reinstate Disciplined Attorney]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order Imposing Disciplinary Action]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Reinstate Disciplined Attorney]
  • August 20, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 19, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
  • August 16, 2021: [Affidavit]
  • August 05, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 04, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • August 02, 2021: [Mail Returned]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order to Show Cause - Attorney Discipline]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order from Indiana Supreme Court Imposing Attorney Discipline]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.