U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00087-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Metts
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 15, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 08, 2021: [Contempt Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 18, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 15, 2021: [Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 15, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • October 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.