U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana

indiana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-00106-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Druesedow
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Consent to Appear by VTC]
  • December 03, 2021: [Pretrial Bond Report]
  • December 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order]
  • November 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing/Deadlines]
  • November 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.