U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-mc-00047
  • Case Name: IN RE: Michael Jon Jacobsma
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • January 07, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 07, 2019: [Public Docket Annotation]
  • January 07, 2019: [Order Supreme Court of Iowa]
  • January 03, 2019: [Order]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Notice - Other]
  • December 13, 2018: [Order by Clerk Attorney Suspension]
  • December 12, 2018: [Order Supreme Court of Iowa]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.