U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Risdal v. Cherokee City Chief of Police et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
March, 2019
  • March 26, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
February, 2019
  • February 28, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.