U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00024
  • Case Name: Sheets v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Judgment]
  • May 27, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 14, 2019: [Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Cases]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 31, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • May 31, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 08, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed as to USA]
March, 2019
  • March 27, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 26, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 05, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • March 01, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.