U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00065
  • Case Name: Strickland v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2020
  • June 05, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 03, 2020: [Order]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 26, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • December 04, 2019: [Transcript]
November, 2019
  • November 08, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
  • November 08, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 07, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Exhibits Receipt]
  • November 07, 2019: [Witness List]
  • November 05, 2019: [Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 29, 2019: [Order]
  • October 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 09, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2019
  • April 23, 2019: [Affidavit]
March, 2019
  • March 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • March 19, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • March 18, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • March 04, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.