U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00068
  • Case Name: Heinemann v. Advantage Sales & Marketing L.L.C. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
April, 2019
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Order]
  • April 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 09, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • April 02, 2019: [Report of Rule 26.f Planning Meeting]
  • April 01, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 01, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
March, 2019
  • March 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 14, 2019: [Order]
  • March 14, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 13, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • March 13, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • March 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.