U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00069
  • Case Name: Jackson v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [USCA Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • November 23, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Compel]
  • June 25, 2021: [Supplement/Addendum]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
May, 2021
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Errata]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • April 22, 2021: [Objections to Bill of Costs]
  • April 15, 2021: [Reply]
  • April 15, 2021: [Bill of Costs]
  • April 08, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 06, 2021: [Compel]
  • April 01, 2021: [Judgment]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 29, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
  • March 29, 2021: [Strike]
  • March 25, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • March 24, 2021: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • March 12, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 11, 2021: [Errata]
  • March 10, 2021: [File Overlength Brief]
  • March 10, 2021: [Reply]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 03, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
February, 2021
  • February 23, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • February 18, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • February 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • February 17, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 16, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 16, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 12, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • December 09, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 07, 2020: [Reply]
  • December 07, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • December 07, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • December 07, 2020: [Strike]
  • December 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • December 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Errata]
  • November 27, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 06, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • November 06, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • November 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
April, 2020
  • April 21, 2020: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2020: [Order]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • April 10, 2020: [Stay]
  • April 01, 2020: [Reply]
  • April 01, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Stay]
  • March 18, 2020: [Compel]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 07, 2020: [Reply]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • January 09, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 08, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 03, 2020: [Compel]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 24, 2019: [Order]
  • September 23, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 03, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
August, 2019
  • August 26, 2019: [Stay]
  • August 26, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 04, 2019: [Brief /Other]
July, 2019
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 05, 2019: [Order]
  • July 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 05, 2019: [Reply]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • June 17, 2019: [Statement]
  • June 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • June 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 03, 2019: [Reply]
May, 2019
  • May 27, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 14, 2019: [Continue]
  • May 14, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 29, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • March 26, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • March 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • March 15, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 08, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 07, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.