U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00006
  • Case Name: TNT Industries, Inc. v. Supermarket Parts Warehouse, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 12, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
March, 2019
  • March 08, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 07, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.