U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:18-cv-04057
  • Case Name: Risdal v. Turner et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: [Strike]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 09, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2020
  • March 21, 2020: [Strike]
  • March 02, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
January, 2020
  • January 06, 2020: [Sanctions]
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Permanent Injunction]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
June, 2019
  • June 06, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2019
  • March 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.