U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:18-cv-01039
  • Case Name: Dakota, Minnesota & Eastern Railroad Corporation v. Marquette Transportation Company, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 09, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 30, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2019
  • May 20, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • May 20, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 14, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.