U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00081
  • Case Name: Escarzaga v. Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 25, 2020: [Stipulation]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • July 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 10, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 10, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • July 09, 2020: [Settlement Conference]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • June 19, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
December, 2019
  • December 05, 2019: [Protective Order]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
September, 2019
  • September 27, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order]
  • September 18, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 18, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 17, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 17, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 16, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 04, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • August 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • August 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 26, 2019: [Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
May, 2019
  • May 21, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 21, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • May 15, 2019: [Stay]
  • May 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 01, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • May 01, 2019: [Dismiss]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • April 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 05, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
March, 2019
  • March 25, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • March 19, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • March 18, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.