U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00031
  • Case Name: Victory Boxing Promotions v. Ennis
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2019
  • December 16, 2019: [Leave to File]
  • December 13, 2019: [Leave]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Order]
  • October 25, 2019: [Status Report]
  • October 25, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 24, 2019: [Reply]
  • October 22, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • October 17, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 03, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 19, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 19, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 18, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • September 18, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 17, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 16, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 16, 2019: [Status Report]
  • September 16, 2019: [Order]
  • September 12, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • September 12, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • September 12, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order]
  • August 21, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 20, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 20, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 20, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 16, 2019: [Order]
  • August 16, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 12, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 07, 2019: [Compel]
  • August 06, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 02, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • July 26, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 23, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order]
  • July 10, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 10, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • July 09, 2019: [Status Report]
  • July 01, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
June, 2019
  • June 14, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 14, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • June 05, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order]
  • June 04, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 04, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 03, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Withdrawal of Document]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • May 17, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • May 13, 2019: [Reply]
  • May 06, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
April, 2019
  • April 22, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • April 15, 2019: [Expedite]
  • April 15, 2019: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
  • April 13, 2019: [Expedite]
  • April 08, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 07, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • April 04, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • April 04, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2019
  • March 28, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.