U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00214
  • Case Name: Caples v. Marmer et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 10, 2021: [USCA Order]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [USCA Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2020: [USCA Case Number]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • November 18, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 18, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2020: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 16, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 16, 2020: [Notice of Appeal]
October, 2020
  • October 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2020
  • September 30, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 28, 2020: [Attorney Fees]
  • September 22, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 21, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
May, 2020
  • May 07, 2020: [Reply]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 01, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
March, 2020
  • March 30, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 04, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • January 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • December 09, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 17, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 10, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Order]
  • June 07, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 08, 2019: [Order]
  • April 03, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.