U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00025
  • Case Name: Rangel Hernandez et al v. Mack et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 29, 2021: [Stipulation]
March, 2021
  • March 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
February, 2021
  • February 16, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 12, 2021: [Settlement Conference]
  • February 03, 2021: [In Limine]
  • February 01, 2021: [In Limine]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 22, 2021: [Order]
  • January 19, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order]
  • January 11, 2021: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 08, 2021: [Status Report]
  • January 06, 2021: [Order]
December, 2020
  • December 21, 2020: [Order]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 11, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • December 08, 2020: [Order]
  • December 08, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Reply]
November, 2020
  • November 25, 2020: [Reply]
  • November 24, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 23, 2020: [Strike]
  • November 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 19, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 16, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • November 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • November 13, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
  • October 22, 2020: [Partial Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • August 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 24, 2020: [Status Report]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
  • March 03, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Errata]
  • February 27, 2020: [Status Report]
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 25, 2019: [Order]
  • November 25, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • November 22, 2019: [Status Report]
  • November 21, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
  • November 12, 2019: [Reply]
  • November 06, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [Protective Order]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Certificate]
  • October 21, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
September, 2019
  • September 17, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • September 13, 2019: [Stipulation]
August, 2019
  • August 09, 2019: [Order]
  • August 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • August 09, 2019: [Status Report]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice - Other]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Order]
  • June 18, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • June 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 05, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 05, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 05, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.