U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00112
  • Case Name: Ruth v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 26, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
  • May 18, 2020: [USCA Order]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
December, 2019
  • December 02, 2019: [Amended Document - NOT Motion]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Reconsideration]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 23, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • October 15, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 09, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • October 07, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Judgment]
  • September 27, 2019: [Order]
  • September 27, 2019: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • September 26, 2019: [Exhibits]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Order]
  • July 31, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 02, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 01, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 11, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • June 07, 2019: [Affidavit]
  • June 05, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 05, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 05, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • June 05, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • June 05, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 28, 2019: [Reconsideration]
  • May 21, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [CJA Attorney Appointment]
  • May 15, 2019: [Order]
  • May 15, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: [Letter]
  • April 24, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • April 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 15, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • April 08, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • April 08, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
  • April 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 05, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.