U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-03005
  • Case Name: Licht v. Georgia Pacific Gypsum, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 07, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.