U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00010
  • Case Name: Christopher Michael & Associates, Inc. v. Color Ink Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • May 04, 2020: [Stipulation]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • April 06, 2020: [Closing Documents]
March, 2020
  • March 16, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 12, 2020: [Continue]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • February 24, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 28, 2019: [Order]
  • October 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 21, 2019: [Notice - Other]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • September 12, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 11, 2019: [Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order]
  • September 09, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 09, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 23, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 12, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
May, 2019
  • May 16, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • May 06, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • April 29, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • April 22, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • April 17, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • April 16, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • April 15, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.