U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:19-cv-04007
  • Case Name: Risdal v. Cherokee City Chief of Police et al--SEE #11 ORDER TERMING DEFT SALTER
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Sanctions]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 23, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
June, 2019
  • June 17, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
April, 2019
  • April 15, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.