U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00129
  • Case Name: Grau v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 16, 2020: [Order]
  • December 10, 2020: [LR 83E Exhibits]
April, 2020
  • April 08, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Letter]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • October 08, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 08, 2019: [Brief /Other]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 04, 2019: [Affidavit]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • July 22, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • May 22, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 21, 2019: [Initial Review Order]
  • May 07, 2019: [Errata]
  • May 06, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
April, 2019
  • April 25, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.