U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00139
  • Case Name: Grady et al v. Waletich Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 15, 2019: [Letter]
  • October 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 11, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • June 11, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Remand to State Court]
  • May 15, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • May 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.