U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:19-cv-02027
  • Case Name: Smart v. Bremer County Jail et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2020
  • May 06, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2019
  • October 21, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 04, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2019
  • September 09, 2019: [Extension of Time]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • July 09, 2019: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.