U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00040
  • Case Name: Farnham v. Commissioner of Social Security
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 04, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Telephone Conference]
  • February 13, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Defendants Responsive Brief - Social Security Cases]
November, 2019
  • November 18, 2019: [Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Cases]
October, 2019
  • October 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
September, 2019
  • September 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 24, 2019: [Order]
  • July 24, 2019: [Transcript - Social Security]
  • July 24, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • May 20, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • May 14, 2019: [Complaint]
  • May 14, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.