U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00056
  • Case Name: Gearhart v. Mediacom Communications Corporation, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: [Bifurcate/Sever]
  • July 23, 2020: [In Limine]
June, 2020
  • June 15, 2020: [Set Aside/Reconsider Order]
May, 2020
  • May 05, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 03, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [Leave to File Document]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • February 25, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • February 25, 2020: [UNRESISTED Motion]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2019
  • August 02, 2019: [Protective Order]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • July 08, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 19, 2019: [Leave to File Document]
  • June 14, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • June 14, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
  • May 16, 2019: [Dismiss]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.