U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00154
  • Case Name: Dickey v. Turner Construction Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2020
  • April 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • April 13, 2020: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 31, 2020: [Closing Documents]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 01, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2019
  • August 05, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Consent]
  • July 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Order]
  • July 03, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 03, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 02, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 26, 2019: [Reply]
  • June 25, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 24, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • June 11, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • June 10, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
May, 2019
  • May 28, 2019: [Order]
  • May 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • May 28, 2019: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • May 23, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.