U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00155
  • Case Name: Conway et al v. Adventure Lands of America, Inc et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice of Stipulated Dismissal]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 25, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • February 25, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 09, 2021: [Reply]
  • February 02, 2021: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 12, 2021: [In Limine]
  • January 12, 2021: [Summary Judgment]
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 26, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • October 19, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 20, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 26, 2019: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • November 18, 2019: [Stipulation]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: [Status Conference]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 01, 2019: [Order]
  • July 01, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 01, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • June 14, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 12, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
May, 2019
  • May 30, 2019: [Order]
  • May 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • May 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • May 24, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 23, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.