U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00013
  • Case Name: XTL, Inc. v. McGinn, Springer & Noethe, PLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • July 13, 2020: [Stipulation]
June, 2020
  • June 23, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • June 23, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 18, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 03, 2020: [Notice - Other]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 21, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • January 20, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • January 20, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • January 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
December, 2019
  • December 23, 2019: [Notice - Other]
November, 2019
  • November 06, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • November 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • November 04, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • November 04, 2019: [Order]
  • November 04, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • September 30, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • September 18, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
  • September 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 16, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • August 15, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 14, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • August 03, 2019: [Order]
  • August 03, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 25, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 22, 2019: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • July 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 18, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 10, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 08, 2019: [Order]
  • July 08, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 03, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 01, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 01, 2019: [Counterclaim]
  • July 01, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 10, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice - Other]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • May 28, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.