U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00164
  • Case Name: Rupe v. O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • August 12, 2019: [Errata]
  • August 12, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 12, 2019: [Counterclaim]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 11, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
  • July 03, 2019: [Extension of Time to File]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 12, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.