U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00163
  • Case Name: Rupe v. Citgo Petroleum Corporation et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 22, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 16, 2020: [Stipulation]
  • January 08, 2020: [Add and Terminate Judges]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: [Status Conference]
  • December 03, 2019: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • December 03, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 21, 2019: [Statement]
  • November 08, 2019: [Statement]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Trial Management Order Deadlines]
  • September 20, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 19, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • July 02, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 02, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 18, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • June 17, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 14, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons Issued]
  • June 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.