U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00165
  • Case Name: Branch-Cross v. Brennan
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 08, 2020: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Transcript]
  • August 19, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 12, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 10, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 05, 2020: [Reply]
  • August 03, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 03, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
July, 2020
  • July 31, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 31, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 31, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 27, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 21, 2020: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • July 13, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 10, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • July 10, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • July 10, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 16, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 03, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order]
  • August 22, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • August 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • August 21, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 19, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • August 13, 2019: [Protective Order]
  • August 13, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 07, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 06, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.