U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cv-00417
  • Case Name: C.P.X. et al v. Foxhoven et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2020
  • March 27, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [Notice - Other]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • August 12, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • August 12, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
  • August 09, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 09, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 09, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • August 02, 2019: [Order on Motion to Redact Transcript]
  • August 01, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • August 01, 2019: [Redact Transcript]
  • August 01, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
July, 2019
  • July 23, 2019: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 22, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 19, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 19, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • July 19, 2019: [Trial Brief]
  • July 10, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 06, 2019: [Transcript]
  • July 02, 2019: [Exhibit List]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Notice - Other]
  • June 23, 2019: [Witness List]
  • June 18, 2019: [Bench Trial - Completed]
  • June 17, 2019: [Bench Trial - Held]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.