U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cv-00046
  • Case Name: McIntire, et al v United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Stipulation]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Extension of Time to File]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Closing Documents]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Settlement]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 17, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • September 15, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
February, 2020
  • February 17, 2020: [Notice - Other]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • January 28, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2020: [Order]
  • January 17, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Order]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • September 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 24, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • September 24, 2019: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2019: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • September 05, 2019: [Order]
  • September 05, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • September 03, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
August, 2019
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 27, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
July, 2019
  • July 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 20, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • June 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.