U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00191
  • Case Name: Saunders v. Thies, et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Supreme Court Filing]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 21, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
  • September 14, 2022: [USCA Order]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Scheduling Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • May 26, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
  • May 24, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [Brief /Other]
  • May 17, 2021: [Statement]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2020: [Joinder]
  • October 15, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • October 08, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 08, 2020: [Certificate of Appealability]
  • October 06, 2020: [Reconsideration]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 28, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 14, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • September 11, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 08, 2020: [Certify Objections of Law]
  • September 08, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • September 03, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Reply]
  • July 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • July 10, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Certify Questions of Law]
May, 2020
  • May 21, 2020: [Reply]
  • May 14, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • May 13, 2020: [Sealed Document]
  • May 13, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • May 12, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
  • May 12, 2020: [Leave to File Under Seal]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 22, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • April 22, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • April 21, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • April 20, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 10, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • April 07, 2020: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 07, 2020: [File Overlength Brief]
March, 2020
  • March 02, 2020: [Protective Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Protective Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Status Conference]
October, 2019
  • October 07, 2019: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • July 29, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • July 29, 2019: [Order]
  • July 29, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • July 29, 2019: [Scheduling Conference]
  • July 22, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Order]
  • June 28, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 28, 2019: [Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal]
  • June 26, 2019: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.