U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Northern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00057
  • Case Name: MCC Iowa LLC v. FARR Technologies, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 24, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 10, 2020: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 09, 2020: [Protective Order]
December, 2019
  • December 12, 2019: [Extension of Time for Scheduling Order Deadlines]
July, 2019
  • July 24, 2019: [UNRESISTED Motion]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.