U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00193
  • Case Name: Pargo v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 12, 2019: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2019: [Order]
September, 2019
  • September 03, 2019: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Response to Habeas Petition]
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 22, 2019: [Order]
June, 2019
  • June 26, 2019: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.