U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00196
  • Case Name: Loza Gil v. United States of America
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [USCA Case Number]
  • May 03, 2021: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Notice of Appeal]
March, 2020
  • March 11, 2020: [Judgment]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
July, 2019
  • July 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 01, 2019: [Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence - 2255]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.