U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:18-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Guy v. Ford Storage & Moving, Co.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • October 09, 2020: [Reply]
  • October 02, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Extension of Time to File]
  • September 15, 2020: [Show Cause]
  • September 11, 2020: [Reply]
  • September 04, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2020
  • August 25, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 24, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 20, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • August 14, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
July, 2020
  • July 01, 2020: [Compel]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • June 23, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 19, 2020: [Order]
  • June 19, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • June 17, 2020: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 16, 2020: [Reply]
  • June 02, 2020: [Compel]
April, 2020
  • April 24, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 19, 2020: [Extension of R16/Scheduline Order Deadlines]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 21, 2020: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • February 21, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 21, 2020: [Extension of Time for Scheduling/R16 Deadlines]
  • February 07, 2020: [Brief /Other]
  • February 07, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2019
  • November 20, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 19, 2019: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 18, 2019: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • November 05, 2019: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2019
  • October 18, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 17, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
September, 2019
  • September 18, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 11, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2019: [Statement]
  • August 09, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 09, 2019: [Summary Judgment]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Reply]
  • July 05, 2019: [Sealed Document]
  • July 02, 2019: [Leave to File Under Seal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.