U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:19-cv-00018
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $55,964.00 in U.S. Currency
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 15, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • October 15, 2020: [Certificate]
September, 2020
  • September 02, 2020: [Designation of Expert Witnesses]
August, 2020
  • August 13, 2020: [Certificate]
  • August 13, 2020: [Notice - Other]
July, 2020
  • July 14, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 10, 2020: [Status Report]
  • July 09, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 06, 2020: [Certificate]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice - Other]
  • July 06, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 02, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order Setting Trial/FPT]
  • May 18, 2020: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • May 08, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • May 08, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 01, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
April, 2020
  • April 15, 2020: [Status Conference]
  • April 06, 2020: [Order]
  • April 06, 2020: [~Util - Set Hearings]
September, 2019
  • September 24, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • September 04, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • September 04, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • September 04, 2019: [Claim]
August, 2019
  • August 19, 2019: [Certificate of Service]
  • August 19, 2019: [Notice - Other]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 16, 2019: [Issuance of Warrant in rem]
  • July 03, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.