U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00209
  • Case Name: Pella Corporation v. Apogee Enterprises, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • October 24, 2019: [Stipulation]
  • October 07, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 04, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 05, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 23, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 15, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 12, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 12, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 09, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 09, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 06, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 01, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • August 01, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 12, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.