U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00210
  • Case Name: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company v. Omni Industries, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 21, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 20, 2020: [Stipulation]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Closing Documents]
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Settlement]
October, 2019
  • October 09, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
September, 2019
  • September 16, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 09, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • September 03, 2019: [Reply]
  • September 03, 2019: [Brief /Other]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • August 27, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 27, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 27, 2019: [Response/Resistance to Motion]
  • August 26, 2019: [Dismiss]
  • August 23, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • August 15, 2019: [Brief /Other]
  • August 14, 2019: [Extension of Time to Answer]
  • August 14, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 14, 2019: [File Overlength Brief]
  • August 14, 2019: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • August 13, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 13, 2019: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • August 09, 2019: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • August 08, 2019: [Pro Hac Vice (Leave to Appear)]
  • August 08, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
  • August 05, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 30, 2019: [Errata]
  • July 29, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • July 25, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest PLAINTIFF]
  • July 17, 2019: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • July 16, 2019: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 16, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 15, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.