U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00208
  • Case Name: Weems v. Officer John Doe et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
December, 2020
  • December 31, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 28, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2020: [Notice - Other]
October, 2020
  • October 07, 2020: [Reconsideration]
  • October 07, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 28, 2020: [Reconsideration]
June, 2020
  • June 18, 2020: [USCA Mandate]
May, 2020
  • May 22, 2020: [USCA Opinion/Judgment]
November, 2019
  • November 26, 2019: [USCA Order]
September, 2019
  • September 20, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2019: [Letter]
  • September 04, 2019: [USCA Order]
  • September 04, 2019: [USCA Case Number]
  • September 03, 2019: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: [Notification of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 27, 2019: [Notice of Appeal]
July, 2019
  • July 19, 2019: [Judgment]
  • July 18, 2019: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.