U.S. Civil Court Records for the Southern District of Iowa

iowa Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the Southern District of Iowa
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:19-cv-00216
  • Case Name: Carrier-Ellison v. First Resources Corporation
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • January 30, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 24, 2020: [Dismiss]
  • January 09, 2020: [Closing Documents]
  • January 09, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
  • January 09, 2020: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 02, 2020: [Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan]
November, 2019
  • November 05, 2019: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2019: [Continue]
October, 2019
  • October 30, 2019: [Order]
  • October 30, 2019: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • October 29, 2019: [Notice of Dismissal R16/Service - Clerk]
  • October 18, 2019: [Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest DEFENDANT]
  • October 18, 2019: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 18, 2019: [Notice of Appearance]
August, 2019
  • August 22, 2019: [Waiver of Service Executed]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet]
  • July 19, 2019: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.